Trustees DESIGN HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1155117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Sally-Anne Huxtable Chair 06 August 2022
None on record
Romy Yogeshbhai Shah Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
Dr Yassmin Nashabe Taan Trustee 06 August 2022
None on record
Naomi Reid-Evans Trustee 06 August 2022
None on record
Dr Dora Souza Dias Trustee 06 August 2022
None on record
Professor Grace Lees-Maffei Trustee 03 September 2021
None on record
Dr Marta Filipova Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Dr Fiona Anderson Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Elli Michaela Young Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record