BARTON-UPON-HUMBER RELIEF IN SICKNESS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing financial help for persons resident in Barton-On-Humber (N Lincolnshire) who are suffering from ill-health and for their relatives / carers in appropriate cases.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 09 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 02 December 1975: Standard registration
- ADA FLOWER TRUST (Working name)
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Spicksley | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
alvin chapman | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANET SMURTHWAITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET SEARLE SRN QDN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 09/10/2019 | 09/10/2020 | 09/10/2021 | 09/10/2022 | 09/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.54k | £2.66k | £2.63k | £2.71k | £2.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £932 | £750 | £0 | £605 | £1.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 09 October 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 October 2022 | 21 October 2024 | 439 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 October 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 October 2020 | 31 January 2022 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 October 2019 | 31 January 2022 | 540 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 9 OCTOBER 1975
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS RESIDENT IN BARTON-ON-HUMBER AREA WHO ARE SICK CONVALESCENTS DISABLED HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM.
Area of benefit
BARTON-UPON-HUMBER
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARKET PLACE
BARTON-UPON-HUMMER
NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE
DN18 5DD
- Phone:
- 07900517424
- Email:
- alvinchappo@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window