OVAL LEARNING CLUSTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support a network of diverse and energetic primary, secondary and special schools in Lambeth to achieve better outcomes and opportunities for children and young people and their families. We connect communities and build capacity to facilitate enriching and educational activities, remove barriers to learning, and build and share skills and resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lambeth
Governance
- 25 March 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sola Ingram | Chair | 28 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Karen Chamberlain | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Linda Campbell | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cordelia Cooper | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.56k | £457.58k | £382.19k | £116.91k | £248.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.81k | £190.32k | £278.89k | £241.11k | £173.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED ON 30 JAN 2014 AS AMENDED ON 16 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES IN AND AROUND THE OVAL AREA OF LONDON IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING A NETWORK OF SCHOOLS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO OFFER OUTSTANDING TEACHING AND EXTRA-CURRICULAR EXPERIENCES, AND TO IMPROVE OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING, GUIDANCE, SUPPORT AND CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Foundry
17 Oval Way
LONDON
SE11 5RR
- Phone:
- 07815192412
- Email:
- hello@ovallearning.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window