Accounts and annual returns ST ANDREWS MAJOR C/W PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1154792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 September 2021 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 December 2020 175 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 02 December 2019 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 07 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required