Trustees GARDENERS' ROYAL BENEVOLENT SOCIETY
Charity number: 1155156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Rochford | Chair | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Seal | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Jean Segall | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lloyd Lawton | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Buchanan-Cook | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ms Cindy Peck | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Hart | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Emma Natalie Tinker | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Steven Mark Palmer | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carole Mary Baxter | Trustee | 17 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.