Financial history THE CH FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity number: 1156222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £8.51m £10.26m £3.22m £15.83m £19.76m
Total expenditure £9.22m £1.53m £4.81m £11.33m £21.29m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.51m £10.26m £3.22m £15.68m £19.57m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £153.34k £189.41k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.22m £1.53m £4.81m £11.33m £21.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £12.61k £17.62k £2.51k £9.33k £16.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £11.01m £21.26m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0