SIKH INSTITUTE OF KNOWLEDGE AND HUMANITY S.I.K.H
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To advance the presence of Sikh education through schools. 2. To advance the education of Sikhs and non-Sikhs in the Sikh religion through social media platforms including YouTube videos to engage a) younger audiences b) far reaching audiences. 3. Promoting knowledge and mutual understanding between the Sikh religion and different religious groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- S.I.K.H. (Working name)
- SIKH INSTITUTE OF KNOWLEDGE AND HUMANITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £98 | £0 | £5.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.97k | £1.40k | £2.11k | £2.47k | £92 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 54 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE SIKH RELIGION, SIKH HISTORY AND CULTURE. 2. THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A. PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; B. ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS. 3. TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROMOTION OF THE PRINCIPLE OF SERVA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window