1ST CHASE TERRACE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 504285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £64.12k £58.08k £54.85k £53.67k £51.88k
Total expenditure £59.13k £53.90k £43.08k £44.11k £49.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A