Accounts and annual returns SOCIETYLINKS TOWER HAMLETS

Charity number: 1154824
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 February 2025 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 February 2025 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 March 2023 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 March 2023 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window