CHURCH OF ENGLAND CENTRAL SERVICES

Charity number: 1155158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.36m £14.18m £14.90m £15.66m £16.99m
Total expenditure £12.36m £14.18m £14.90m £15.66m £17.00m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £28.74k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £12.36m £14.18m £14.90m £15.66m £16.99m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.36m £14.18m £14.90m £15.66m £17.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £18.00k £15.00k £14.92k £15.61k £19.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0