CHURCH OF ENGLAND CENTRAL SERVICES

Charity number: 1155158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Canon Elizabeth Renshaw MBE Trustee 27 February 2020
CHURCH COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND Received: On time
THE CHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
HAROLD CLIVE MATHER Trustee 01 May 2019
EMMAUS ROAD COMMUNITY CHURCH Received: On time
THE MATTHEW 25 35 TRUST Received: On time
THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND PENSIONS BOARD Received: On time
JOHN ANDREW SPENCE OBE Chair 25 November 2013 None on record
The Venerable Samantha Jayne Rushton Trustee 13 February 2020
THE YORK DIOCESAN CLERGY DEPENDANTS FUND Received: On time
THE TURNER HUDSON RETIRED CLERGY FUND Received: On time
UNIVERSITY OF YORK CHAPLAINCY CENTRE
THE YORK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED Received: On time
THE YORK DIOCESAN MINISTERS' RELIEF (2009) FUND Received: On time
Nikesh Patel Trustee 13 February 2020
THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND PENSIONS BOARD Received: On time
Alan Nigel Smith Trustee 01 October 2021 None on record