Accounts and annual returns SMALL-STEPS CHARITY
Charity number: 1157097
Charity reporting is up to date (108 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 February 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 February 2024 | 473 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 April 2022 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 April 2022 | 517 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 22 October 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window