LINCOLNSHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity number: 504307
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 March 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 March 2021 52 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2020 350 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 January 2020 350 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 February 2017 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 February 2017 9 days late Download