Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, ST LEONARDS AND ST IVES

Charity number: 1155076
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £94.62k £165.94k £83.62k £78.94k £61.26k
Total expenditure £105.73k £107.71k £118.65k £116.52k £74.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A