Accounts and annual returns WOODSIDE PARK ERUV COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1157984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 05 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 02 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required