Financial history CLOWNS WITHOUT BORDERS UK

Charity number: 1156987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £19.49k £40.21k £120.91k £42.90k £53.82k
Total expenditure £16.98k £29.30k £94.68k £39.98k £50.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A