CLOWNS WITHOUT BORDERS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Clowns Without Borders uses laughter and play as a stabilising force for children living in crisis zones. Working with professional artists and facilitators, we share performances and workshops to encourage children to connect with childish impulses and a sense of fun. It is our mission to alleviate suffering by sharing joy and wonder when they need it most. We work in the UK and globally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Ealing
- Surrey
- Tower Hamlets
- Mozambique
- Turkey
- Ukraine
Governance
- 08 May 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rutendo Rumano | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Milica Vukovic-Smart | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Matthew David Downer | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|||||
SHARON MCCLENAGHAN | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr unni krishnan | Trustee | 09 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Wendy Adele Lanchin | Trustee | 09 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Annabel Morgan | Trustee | 06 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.91k | £42.90k | £53.82k | £247.63k | £428.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.68k | £39.98k | £50.77k | £228.90k | £334.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03/04/2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF NEED AND SUFFERING OF PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WHO ARE RESIDENT IN AREAS OF CRISIS, BY: (A) THE PROVISION, AND ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION, OF NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL PROGRAMS AND ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THE SOCIAL WELFARE AND CONDITIONS OF LIFE, EDUCATION AND HEALTH OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM THE AFFECTS OF LIVING IN AREAS OF CRISIS WHICH RESULT IN POVERTY, TRAUMA, DISLOCATION, MARGINALISATION AND SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC UPHEAVAL. (B) PROMOTING AND RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMANITARIAN ISSUES THROUGH HUMOROUS PERFORMANCES AS A MEANS OF PSYCHOLOGICAL SUPPORT TO THOSE AFFECTED BY THE ISSUES DESCRIBED IN (A). FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS PROVISION, 'AREAS OF CRISIS' MAY INCLUDE, BUT IS NOT LIMITED TO: REFUGEE CAMPS, CONFLICT ZONES AND TERRITORIES IN SITUATIONS OF NATURAL OR MAN-MADE EMERGENCIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dean House
Skircoat Green
Halifax
West Yorkshire
HX3 0SA
- Phone:
- 07939 522 518
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window