BRANCEPETH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £17.60k £17.82k £14.45k £22.90k £25.78k
Total expenditure £18.91k £22.30k £15.64k £20.70k £20.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.20k £5.19k £3.38k £8.40k £20.61k