BRANCEPETH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Anna Lesley Brooker Trustee 05 September 2019 None on record
Martyn Thomas Jones Trustee 28 March 2019 None on record
Ian Stoker Trustee 28 March 2019 None on record
JEAN MERRINGTON Trustee 31 May 2018 None on record
GERALDINE CLAIRE JENNINGS Trustee 14 March 2014 None on record
JOANNE DALTON Trustee 23 July 2015 None on record