BISHOPS STORTFORD SCOUT DISTRICT

Charity number: 1154953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £103.45k £97.96k £158.43k £94.34k £65.80k
Total expenditure £92.33k £90.81k £162.71k £99.44k £59.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A