HIGHFIELD FRIENDS AND PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1155274
Charity reporting is up to date (133 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £17.16k £8.70k £12.54k £16.86k £15.60k
Total expenditure £24.53k £8.94k £11.13k £18.94k £11.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A