Accounts and annual returns NORTH ILFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD
Charity number: 1162811

Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 September 2022 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 21 September 2022 | 386 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 21 September 2022 | 386 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 21 September 2022 | 751 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 21 September 2022 | 1117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | 21 September 2022 | 1117 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | Overdue | Overdue by 1666 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Overdue | Overdue by 1666 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window