Financial history THE CHELLINGTON CENTRE

Charity number: 1156511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £119.98k £104.09k £130.23k £142.40k £265.41k
Total expenditure £104.93k £105.98k £119.34k £98.36k £101.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £40.40k £27.53k