ST MARTIN'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1155711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £137.89k £164.44k £169.80k £162.76k £158.01k
Total expenditure £154.42k £175.18k £169.89k £159.82k £142.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £4.18k N/A