ST MARTIN'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At St Martin's Pre-School, Epsom we aim to provide a happy, friendly, enjoyable and secure environment for children of different backgrounds and abilities. Their welfare, development and all round well-being are our main priorities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 February 2014: CIO registration
- 19 February 2015: Funds received from 1023678 ST MARTINS PRE-SCHOOL
- ST MARTIN'S PRE-SCHOOL CIO (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Jones | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Wilkinson | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Hopkins | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kristy Bond | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Priscilla Simms | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Nicholas James Speirs | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
HENRIETTA KNELL | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162.76k | £158.01k | £211.89k | £205.58k | £228.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.82k | £142.26k | £185.19k | £226.77k | £203.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 10 Feb 2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY (1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY (2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT (3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING (4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS (5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO AND (6) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O ST MARTIN'S PRE-SCHOOL
ST MARTIN'S CHILDREN'S CENTRE
WORPLE ROAD
EPSOM
SURREY
KT18 7AA
- Phone:
- 01372 721111
- Email:
- admin@stmartinspreschool.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window