Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, COPTHORNE

Charity number: 1155185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 07 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window