FAIR FROME

Charity number: 1156185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download