FAIR FROME

Charity number: 1156185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert James Cannings Trustee 10 September 2018 None on record
Karen Louise Stewart Trustee 12 February 2018 None on record
Mark Dorrington Trustee 26 March 2014 None on record
Bob Ashford Chair 26 March 2014 None on record
Rhian Ramsden Trustee 12 February 2018 None on record
Sarah Louise Perrett Trustee 10 March 2019 None on record
Karen Huckle Trustee 12 February 2017 None on record
Sarah Butler Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
BEVERLEY GODDARD Trustee 24 November 2020 None on record
Carole Whittard Trustee 26 March 2014 None on record
John Anderson Killah Trustee 08 April 2019 None on record