CHRISTCHURCH COMMUNITY COFFEE

Charity number: 1155334
Charity is in administration
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020
Annual return 31 December 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019
Annual return 31 December 2018
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018
Annual return 31 December 2017
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 May 2017 On time Download