CHRISTCHURCH COMMUNITY COFFEE

Charity number: 1155334
Charity is in administration
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £75.14k £78.11k £81.59k £87.93k £90.51k
Total expenditure £70.81k £79.23k £85.13k £88.20k £90.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A