ANIMAL WELFARE LAW MATTERS

Charity number: 1155926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 29/09/2018 29/09/2019 29/09/2020
Total gross income £222 £50.00k £50.16k £193 £121
Total expenditure £7.69k £14.55k £7.19k £8.22k £11.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A