Accounts and annual returns EDUCATORS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1156412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 27 May 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 31 May 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 28 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 28 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 01 June 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 01 June 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window