MANUEL BRAVO PROJECT

Charity number: 1156119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £156.00k £136.77k £134.70k £186.96k £186.87k
Total expenditure £109.00k £173.26k £139.32k £164.02k £174.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £1.00k £200