MANUEL BRAVO PROJECT

Charity number: 1156119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amna Rashid Trustee 28 April 2016 None on record
Ruth Anna Woodhead Trustee 01 December 2016 None on record
Dr Catherine Beaumont Chair 24 April 2017 None on record
Hannah Mary Harratt Bentley Trustee 14 September 2019 None on record
Rev Michael Wood Trustee 22 July 2019 None on record
Rosie Cooke Trustee 22 July 2019 None on record
Mandy Crawford-Lee Trustee 22 July 2019 None on record
Iona Lyons Trustee 22 July 2019 None on record