BURY ST EDMUNDS ISLAMIC CULTURAL ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1158903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 28 November 2018 335 days late Download
Annual return 29 February 2016 02 February 2017 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2016 02 February 2017 35 days late Download