KNIGHTON HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 504349
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 15 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 03 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required