INNOVATION FOR AGRICULTURE

Charity number: 1155563
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul James Westaway Chair 17 December 2015 None on record
David Galbraith Trustee 04 July 2017 None on record
Robert Nicholas Foord Drewett Trustee 24 December 2013
High Sheriff of Somerset Charitable Trust Received: On time
NATIONAL EYE RESEARCH CENTRE Received: On time
THE LANGFORD TRUST FOR ANIMAL HEALTH AND WELFARE Received: On time
GRATEFUL SOCIETY Received: On time
WELLS CATHEDRAL PRESERVATION TRUST Received: On time
ROYAL AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY OF THE COMMONWEALTH Received: On time
THE ROYAL BATH AND WEST OF ENGLAND SOCIETY Received: On time
ANDREW WILLIAM WARD MBE Trustee 27 October 2015
FORAGE AID Received: On time
LINCOLNSHIRE AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY Received: On time
DR CHRIS TUFNELL Trustee 01 August 2017 None on record