BARNES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1156379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £226.82k £222.48k £229.07k £214.84k £207.27k
Total expenditure £222.24k £217.66k £245.37k £208.56k £223.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £12.18k £9.53k £22.38k £13.49k