Accounts and annual returns THE BIRMINGHAM BIG ART FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2021 334 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 September 2021 334 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window