THE BIRMINGHAM BIG ART FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Foundation are as defined in clause 3 of the Constitution and are to promote art and the City of Birmingham for the benefit of the public by the establishment of public artwork in Birmingham?. Through the Birmingham Bit Art Project, the Birmingham Big Art Foundation aims to commission an internationally significant work of public contemporary art for the city of Birmingham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 18 March 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Chin Kuen Wong | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Michael James Ward | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
ROBIN BARNES | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|||||||
Stephen Hartland | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|||||||
COUNCILLOR IAN WARD | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
GLYN PITCHFORD | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.44k | £15.37k | £10.02k | £12.22k | £7.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.46k | £68.16k | £9.52k | £4.21k | £22.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2021 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2021 | 334 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE ART WITHIN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF PUBLIC ART IN BIRMINGHAM.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
One Eleven
Edmund Street
BIRMINGHAM
B3 2HJ
- Phone:
- 07831550206
- Email:
- secretary@bbaf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window