Financial history NATIONAL COMMUNITY LAND TRUST NETWORK

Charity number: 1156952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £247.01k £2.50m £4.82m £513.91k £4.36m
Total expenditure £288.34k £2.42m £4.51m £724.74k £4.40m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.00m £4.00m N/A £4.01m
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £4.25m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £17.52k £13.82k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £2.50m £4.82m £496.39k £100.02k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £340 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £2.42m £4.51m £724.74k £4.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £8.00k £0 £10.30k £7.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £63.24k £3.63m
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0