Accounts and annual returns HENRY OLDFIELD TRUST

Charity number: 1156496
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 February 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 February 2022 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window