Financial history HENRY OLDFIELD TRUST

Charity number: 1156496
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.92m £6.68m £2.33m £337.22k £1.03m
Total expenditure £1.35m £351.56k £1.82m £1.28m £1.62m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.81m £6.51m £2.08m N/A £878.30k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £104.56k £175.42k £251.86k N/A £148.30k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.35m £351.56k £1.82m N/A £1.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.10k £4.68k £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.34m £346.88k £1.82m N/A £1.62m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0