FRIENDS OF STRATFORD GIRLS' GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Discos, FOS 200 Club, New to You Uniform Sales, Quiz Night, Fun Nights, Music and Arts at the Manor and other fund raising events within the school community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 18 July 1975: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF SHOTTERY GRAMMAR SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Blackwall | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
San Jameson | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Welton | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Friend | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.57k | £11.59k | £9.05k | £10.70k | £17.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.33k | £8.22k | £2.06k | £15.45k | £12.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 24.11.1970 AS AMENDED 16.10.1974. as amended on 27 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
SHOTTERY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stratford Girls Grammar School
Shottery Village
Shottery
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Warwickshire
CV37 9HA
- Phone:
- 07935155179
- Email:
- fos@sggs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window