Financial history INTERNATIONAL ALLIANCE OF PATIENTS' ORGANIZATIONS

Charity number: 1155577
Charity reporting is up to date (220 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £510.22k £343.86k £509.09k £380.71k £582.64k
Total expenditure £547.04k £366.89k £436.45k £270.66k £399.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities £382 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £509.84k N/A £509.09k N/A £579.33k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 N/A £84
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A £3.23k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £547.04k N/A £436.45k N/A £399.13k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A £0