Accounts and annual returns BLACK COUNTRY WHEELS

Charity number: 1157795
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 05 May 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 May 2022 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 14 October 2020 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 14 October 2020 167 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 25 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 25 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 17 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 17 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window