YOUTH LEADS UK

Charity number: 1155789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 06 April 2018 15 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2018 15 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 06 April 2017 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2017 29 August 2017 On time Download