YOUTH LEADS UK

Charity number: 1155789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Saimah Malji Chair 12 October 2015 None on record
KHALIL MALJI Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
ADAM TOORAWA Trustee 21 February 2014 None on record
Lydia German Trustee 26 January 2018 None on record
Chloe Maria Bennett Trustee 02 September 2019 None on record