FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS CHURCH, BOLTON PERCY

Charity number: 504363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise money for the repair, upkeep, cleaning, preservation and conservation of the fabric of the ancient Church and Churchyard of All Saints, Bolton Percy, North Yorkshire, by donations with optional gift aid, gifts, functions, grants and any other means.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £9,745
Total expenditure: £1,890

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 July 1975: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alan Swain Chair 03 March 2014
None on record
Dr Michael Paul Heyworth Trustee 19 March 2024
None on record
Patricia Watson Trustee 22 March 2023
None on record
IAN CONNOLLY Trustee
DAME MARY LINDSAY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.51k £5.25k £6.64k £7.72k £9.74k
Total expenditure £6.69k £1.46k £1.26k £1.81k £1.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SOUTH GLEBE
MAIN STREET
BOLTON PERCY
YORK
YO23 7AQ
Phone:
01904744611
Website:

No information available