Governance LEEDS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Charity number: 1155876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 20 February 2014: Standard registration
- 09 September 2015: Funds received from 254726 THE WAKEFIELD DIOCESAN CHURCH ORGANISATION SOCIETY
- 09 September 2015: Funds received from 507879 WAKEFIELD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
- 28 September 2015: Funds received from 249315 THE WAKEFIELD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
- 26 November 2015: Funds received from 1070206 THE BRADFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
- 17 December 2015: Funds received from 249860 RIPON AND LEEDS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
No other names
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.